They dont work for free either.Yous thinking these people gonna work for free. Me and buck aren’t educated we only gotta grade 6. We can still commmunikate though. We’s a happy family. Do you think these people are gonna work for free.....theres been some pretty high powered people working for the company. Fees for their services rangin from $96-500K a year. How do they figure RB got all this money..... Lyin, lyin, lyin, Add in Javan, Wallstreet, Ferreira,.
The Company believes its future success will depend in
large part on its continuing ability to attract, train and retain skilled
technical, sales, marketing and customer support personnel.
October 1, 2000 to September 30, 2001: High* Low*
------ -----
October to December $ 5.03 $1.63
January to March $ 3.31 $1.44
April to June $ 2.40 $2.00
July to September $ 2.30 $2.30
Would Wolf put in his own money to keep G8 going? No, he doesn’t have any.
Short-term loans of $124,771 were advanced to the Company by shareholders
during the period. The funds were used for operating capital. As of March
31, 2002, a total of $232,604 is outstanding on short-term loans advanced
to the Company.
Changes in the Appointments of the Company’s President and CEO: On January 28, 2005, Peter Gardner resigned as President of the Company and Ralph Petruzzo was appointed as President, Director and CEO of the Company until April 24th, 2006. Mr. Gardner resumed his appointment as President and Chief Executive Officer of the Company until March 2007 when Mr. Edwin Kroeker was appointed President and CEO. Mr. Gardner remains a director of the Company.
Engagement of HDR Brown Vence and Associates, Inc.: In June 2006 the Company entered into a consulting services agreement with California based HDR Brown Venice and Associates, Inc. (“HDR”) a worldwide engineering and architectural consulting company, which provides a wide range of technical related and professional services for various complex industrial projects. HDR will be utilized by the Company in the evaluation of its projects in respect to project feasibility, design, implementation and operational supervision. The Company has paid approximately $75,000 to HDR as at September 30th, 2006. The Company intends to continue to work closely with HDR with respect to its opportunities for various projects and in the development of technologies that will be proprietary to the Company.
EMPLOYEES
For the past twenty-four months ending September 30th, 2006 the Company has continued to have one employee and ten consultants. Of those 11 employees and consultants, two were classified as executive officers, five as administrative personnel, and four as sales and marketing personnel. The Company’s consultants and employees do not belong to a collective bargaining unit, and the Company is not aware of any labor union organizing activity. The Company believes its future success will depend in large part on its continuing ability to attract, train and retain skilled technical, sales, marketing and customer support personnel.
The following individuals were appointed as Director's and executive officers of
the Company:
Perry Smith Director (January 30, 2002)
David Kirske CFO (January 30, 2002) - (Resigned March 11, 2002)
James C. Florio Director, Chairman (March 19, 2002) - (Resigned August 29, 2002)
Ralph Petruzzo Director (May 22, 2002)
Larry Gold Director (July 23, 2002) - (Resigned October 22, 2002)
</TABLE>
On March 19, 2002 the Board of Directors of the Company accepted the resignation
of Robert L. Jackman and appointed:
Perry Smith President
The following table sets forth the name, age and position of each Director and
Executive Officer of the Company as of September 30, 2002.
NAME AGE POSITION
---- --- --------
Perry Smith 41 President and Director of Duro Enzyme
Dean Branconnier 33 Vice President and Director of Duro Enzyme
Ralph Petruzzo 50 Director
Larry Gold 58 Director
ITEM 9. | DIRECTORS, EXECUTIVE OFFICERS, PROMOTERS AND CONTROL PERSONS; COMPLIANCE WITH SECTION 16(a) OF THE EXCHANGE ACT |
The following information sets forth the names of the Company’s officers and directors, their present positions with the Company, and their biographical information:
Name | | Age | | Position |
| | | | |
Edwin Kroeker | | 58 | | Chief Executive Officer, President and Director |
Peter Gardner | | 46 | | Director |
Dean Branconnier | | 38 | | Chief Financial Officer, Treasurer and Director |
| | | | |
Michael Brown | | 58 | | Director |