Legend: |
Insider's Relationship to Issuer: 1 - Issuer, 2 - Subsidiary of Issuer, 3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer, 6 - Director or Senior Officer of 10% Security Holder, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6), 8 - Deemed Insider - 6 Months before becoming Insider. |
|
Issuer Name: |
SelectCore Ltd. |
|
Date of Last Reported
Transaction(YYYY-MM-DD) |
Security
Designation |
Registered
Holder |
Closing Balance |
Insider's calculated balance |
Closing balance of equivalent number
or value of underlying securities |
|
Insider Name: |
Abuleil, Mohammad |
|
Insider Relationship: |
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer |
|
Ceased to be Insider: |
2011-07-06 |
|
|
2011-05-02 |
Common Shares |
|
5,894,037 |
|
|
|
|
2010-09-13 |
Common Shares |
Muna AlJundi |
388,000 |
|
|
|
|
2011-06-30 |
Options (Common Shares) |
|
1,550,000 |
|
1,150,001 |
|
Insider Name: |
Altman, Yoel |
|
Insider Relationship: |
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer |
|
Ceased to be Insider: |
Not Applicable |
|
|
2004-08-13 |
Common Shares |
|
333,333 |
|
|
|
|
2004-08-13 |
Options (Common Shares) |
|
158,333 |
|
158,333 |
|
Insider Name: |
Bernholtz, Martin |
|
Insider Relationship: |
4 - Director of Issuer |
|
Ceased to be Insider: |
Not Applicable |
|
|
2012-06-22 |
Common Shares |
|
7,164,354 |
|
|
|
|
2011-08-08 |
Options (Common Shares) |
|
400,000 |
|
-110,000 |
|
Insider Name: |
Bongard, Myra |
|
Insider Relationship: |
4 - Director of Issuer |
|
Ceased to be Insider: |
Not Applicable |
|
|
2004-08-13 |
Common Shares |
|
333,333 |
|
|
|
|
2004-08-13 |
Options (Common Shares) |
|
158,333 |
|
158,333 |
|
Insider Name: |
Burdon, Peter |
|
Insider Relationship: |
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer |
|
Ceased to be Insider: |
Not Applicable |
|
|
2009-11-09 |
Common Shares |
|
1,490,003 |
|
|
|
|
2009-11-09 |
Common Shares |
Terri-Lynn Hughes |
0 |
|
|
|
|
2009-11-09 |
Options (Common Shares) |
|
900,000 |
|
900,000 |
|
Insider Name: |
Cikalo, Robert Paul |
|
Insider Relationship: |
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer |
|
Ceased to be Insider: |
2008-03-05 |
|
|
2007-12-13 |
Common Shares |
|
9,359,670 |
|
|
|
|
2006-09-25 |
Common Shares |
1544890 Ontario Inc |
386,510 |
|
|
|
|
2007-08-01 |
Options (Common Shares) |
Robert Cikalo |
1,255,000 |
|
1,255,000 |
|
|
2006-09-25 |
Warrants (Common Shares) |
1544890 Ontario Inc |
386,510 |
|
386,510 |
|
Insider Name: |
Deslippe, Ryan Charles |
|
Insider Relationship: |
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer |
|
Ceased to be Insider: |
2013-01-21 |
|
|
2011-05-02 |
Common Shares |
|
9,625,833 |
|
|
|
|
2009-01-21 |
Common Shares |
1544889 Ontario Ltd. |
438,045 |
|
|
|
|
2011-06-30 |
Options (Common Shares) |
|
2,555,000 |
|
2,555,000 |
|
|
2006-09-25 |
Warrants (Common Shares) |
1544889 Ontario Ltd. |
515,347 |
|
515,347 |
|
Insider Name: |
Inca Gold Corp |
|
Insider Relationship: |
4 - Director of Issuer |
|
Ceased to be Insider: |
Not Applicable |
|
|
2006-11-08 |
Common Shares |
|
313,333 |
|
|
|
Insider Name: |
Matrix Funds Management (div. of Growth Works Capital Ltd.) & Affiliates |
|
Insider Relationship: |
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer |
|
Ceased to be Insider: |
2011-02-28 |
|
Insider Name: |
McKenzie, Keith |
|
Insider Relationship: |
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer |
|
Ceased to be Insider: |
Not Applicable |
|
|
2011-05-02 |
Common Shares |
|
8,556,332 |
|
|
|
|
2007-02-01 |
Common Shares |
Sharon McKenzie |
4,144,785 |
|
|
|
|
2011-07-04 |
Options (Common Shares) |
|
2,155,000 |
|
355,000 |
|
|
2006-09-25 |
Warrants (Common Shares) |
|
164,443 |
|
164,443 |
|
Insider Name: |
Newman, G. Michael |
|
Insider Relationship: |
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer |
|
Ceased to be Insider: |
2008-12-01 |
|
|
2008-11-13 |
Common Shares |
|
200,000 |
|
|
|
|
2007-07-31 |
Options (Common Shares) |
|
341,666 |
|
341,666 |
|
Insider Name: |
Newman, George Michael |
|
Insider Relationship: |
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer |
|
Ceased to be Insider: |
Not Applicable |
|
Insider Name: |
Parkes, David Bruce |
|
Insider Relationship: |
4 - Director of Issuer |
|
Ceased to be Insider: |
2009-02-01 |
|
|
2008-03-26 |
Common Shares |
|
633,333 |
|
|
|
|
2009-01-15 |
Options (Common Shares) |
|
750,000 |
|
163,333 |
|
Insider Name: |
ROHRER, MICHAEL CHRISTOPHER |
|
Insider Relationship: |
4 - Director of Issuer |
|
Ceased to be Insider: |
Not Applicable |
|
|
2012-06-22 |
Common Shares |
|
211,111 |
|
|
|
|
2011-06-30 |
Options (Common Shares) |
|
500,000 |
|
500,000 |
|
|
|