RNS Number : 0242G
Magyar Fejlesztesi Bank
02 August 2016
Announcement
Concerning management change
In accordance with of the extraordinary disclosure obligation stipulated under Section 122 of (Hungarian) Act
CCXXXVII of 2013 on Credit Institutions and Financial Enterprises and under Section 55 of (Hungarian) Act CXX of 2001 on the
Capital Market MFB Hungarian Development Bank Private Limited Company (hereinafter: MFB Zrt.) informs the public of the following
changes in respect of the management:
Mr. Dániel Lontai, Chairman of Board of Directors has resigned from his position with effect from 31 July 2016. As
of 1 August 2016, Mr. Csaba Nagy, Chief Executive Officer of MFB Zrt. has been elected by the Board of Directors as the new
chairman.
As of 21 July 2016, Mr. János Lipcsei has resigned as member of the Supervisory Board of MFB Zrt.
Budapest, 2 August 2016
MFB Hungarian Development Bank Private Limited Company
This information is provided by RNS
The company news service from the London Stock Exchange
END
BOAUUUORNVAWRAR