RE:berendt sells over 2 million shares!!!!!!!!!!!He only had 310K shares, the rest ( 5.8M ) were options exercisable at .33.
When did he exercise and sell?
Here is the current SEDI look...Is somebody telling stories??
nsider Name: | Berendt, Michael Joseph | |
Insider Relationship: | 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer | |
Ceased to be Insider: | Not Applicable | |
| 2015-08-18 | Common Shares | | 310,602 | | | |
| 2015-09-09 | Options common (Common Shares) | | 5,850,000 | | 5,850,000 | |
Insider Name: | Bioniche Life Sciences Inc. | |
Insider Relationship: | 1 - Issuer | |
Ceased to be Insider: | Not Applicable | |
| 2010-10-25 | Common Shares | | 0 | | | |
Insider Name: | Boudreau, Mathieu | |
Insider Relationship: | 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer | |
Ceased to be Insider: | Not Applicable | |
| 2015-12-31 | Common Shares | Sunlife Canada | 40,992 | | | |
| 2015-09-09 | Options common (Common Shares) | | 1,400,000 | | 1,400,000 | |
Insider Name: | Budd, Roderick Edward | |
Insider Relationship: | 4 - Director of Issuer | |
Ceased to be Insider: | 2015-06-30 | |
| 2014-01-20 | Common Shares | | 86,129 | | | |
| 2015-02-18 | Options common (Common Shares) | | 75,000 | | 75,000 | |
| 2013-09-20 | Warrants (Common Shares) | | 25,000 | | 25,000 | |
Insider Name: | Butler, Deborah Iris | |
Insider Relationship: | 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer | |
Ceased to be Insider: | 2015-01-31 | |
| 2009-05-29 | Common Shares | | 2,426 | | | |
| 2011-02-16 | Common Shares | Personal RRSP | 10,000 | | | |
| 2013-12-31 | Common Shares | Sunlife | 150,771 | | | |
| 2013-01-02 | Options common (Common Shares) | | 150,000 | | 150,000 | |
Insider Name: | Champagne, Monique | |
Insider Relationship: | 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer | |
Ceased to be Insider: | Not Applicable | |
| 2015-12-02 | Common Shares | | 12,000 | | | |
| 2015-12-31 | Common Shares | Sunlife | 322,207 | | | |
| 2015-09-09 | Options common (Common Shares) | | 610,000 | | 610,000 | |
Insider Name: | Charette, Francois Guy | |
Insider Relationship: | 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer | |
Ceased to be Insider: | 2010-12-31 | |
| 2010-09-28 | Common Shares | | 173,237 | | | |
| 2010-09-20 | Options common (Common Shares) | | 96,780 | | 96,780 | |
Insider Name: | Culbert, Charles Richard | |
Insider Relationship: | 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer | |
Ceased to be Insider: | 2014-05-30 | |
| 2013-12-31 | Common Shares | | 85,736 | | | |
| 2013-02-08 | Common Shares | CIBC Wood Gundy | 129,566 | | | |
| 2013-12-31 | Common Shares | Sunlife | 104,286 | | | |
| 2013-01-02 | Options common (Common Shares) | | 270,000 | | 270,000 | |
Insider Name: | Cunningham, Margaret (Peggy) Helen | |
Insider Relationship: | 4 - Director of Issuer | |
Ceased to be Insider: | 2013-11-05 | |
| 2013-10-01 | Common Shares | | 169,379 | | | |
| 2013-01-02 | Options common (Common Shares) | | 110,000 | | 123,600 | |
Insider Name: | Desbiens, Pierre-Yves | |
Insider Relationship: | 4 - Director of Issuer | |
Ceased to be Insider: | 2010-11-09 | |
| 2009-07-28 | Common Shares | | 66,217 | | | |
| 2008-11-11 | Common Shares | Pierre-Yves Desbiens - RRSP (Wood Gundy) # 552-22206-14 | 0 | | | |
| 2009-11-12 | Options common (Common Shares) | | 75,000 | | 0 | |
Insider Name: | Dunlop, Leslie Jane | |
Insider Relationship: | 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer | |
Ceased to be Insider: | 2008-11-06 | |
| 2008-02-22 | Common Shares | | 139,045 | | | |
| 2008-02-22 | Common Shares | Scotia McLeod | 11,679 | | | |
| 2006-11-26 | Options common (Common Shares) | | 125,000 | | 125,000 | |
Insider Name: | Elrafih, Mohamed | |
Insider Relationship: | 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer | |
Ceased to be Insider: | 2014-10-31 | |
| 2013-12-31 | Common Shares | | 182,296 | | | |
| 2013-12-31 | Common Shares | Sunlife | 193,607 | | | |
| 2013-01-02 | Options common (Common Shares) | | 223,000 | | 223,000 | |
Insider Name: | Fonds de solidarit FTQ | |
Insider Relationship: | 3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer | |
Ceased to be Insider: | 2010-10-04 | |
| 2010-10-04 | Common Shares | | 6,521,677 | | | |
| 2010-10-04 | Preferred Shares Series 2 | | 0 | | | |
Insider Name: | Ford, Brian Douglas | |
Insider Relationship: | 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer | |
Ceased to be Insider: | Not Applicable | |
| 2013-12-31 | Common Shares | | 119,731 | | | |
| 2015-12-31 | Common Shares | Sunlife Canada | 33,057 | | | |
| 2015-09-09 | Options common (Common Shares) | | 510,000 | | 510,000 | |
Insider Name: | Fortin, Lyne | |
Insider Relationship: | 4 - Director of Issuer | |
Ceased to be Insider: | Not Applicable | |
| 2016-02-26 | Common Shares | | 200,290 | | | |
| 2015-08-18 | Common Shares | Claude Perrotte | 132,159 | | | |
| 2015-11-12 | Options common (Common Shares) | | 225,000 | | 225,000 | |
Insider Name: | Garland, Gail Frances | |
Insider Relationship: | 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer | |
Ceased to be Insider: | 2008-03-18 | |
| 2008-01-31 | Common Shares | Royal Bank | 15,187 | | | |
| 2007-12-31 | Common Shares | Sunlife | 76,741 | | | |
| 2006-01-12 | Options common (Common Shares) | | 55,000 | | 55,000 | |
Insider Name: | Grant, Andrew Gerard | |
Insider Relationship: | 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer | |
Ceased to be Insider: | 2014-04-15 | |
| 2013-12-31 | Common Shares | | 82,521 | | | |
| 2013-12-31 | Common Shares | Sunlife | 159,153 | | | |
| 2013-01-02 | Options common (Common Shares) | | 185,000 | | 185,000 | |
Insider Name: | Gratton, Andr | |
Insider Relationship: | 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer | |
Ceased to be Insider: | Not Applicable | |
| 2015-11-18 | Common Shares | hold through his wife | 2,500 | | | |
| 2015-12-31 | Common Shares | Sunlife Canada | 107,249 | | | |
| 2015-09-09 | Options common (Common Shares) | | 350,000 | | 350,000 | |
Insider Name: | Groch, Brian James | |
Insider Relationship: | 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer | |
Ceased to be Insider: | Not Applicable | |
| 2015-10-07 | Options common (Common Shares) | | 2,000,000 | | 2,000,000 | |
Insider Name: | Groome, Cameron Lionel | |
Insider Relationship: | 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer | |
Ceased to be Insider: | 2012-04-23 | |
| 2011-12-31 | Common Shares | | 315,957 | | | |
| 2011-12-31 | Common Shares | Sunlife | 22,176 | | | |
| 2011-06-21 | Options common (Common Shares) | | 1,000,000 | | 1,000,000 | |
Insider Name: | Gubitz, Gregory David | |
Insider Relationship: | 4 - Director of Issuer | |
Ceased to be Insider: | 2014-11-26 | |
| 2014-07-21 | Common Shares | | 14,109 | | | |
| 2014-07-21 | Common Shares | Grosvenor Ventures Inc. | 0 | | | |
| 2014-03-18 | Options common (Common Shares) | | 25,000 | | 25,000 | |
| 2013-09-26 | Warrants (Common Shares) | Grosvenor Ventures Inc. | 43,100 | | 43,100 | |
Insider Name: | Howes, John Arthur | |
Insider Relationship: | 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer | |
Ceased to be Insider: | 2009-05-28 | |
| 2008-02-15 | Common Shares | | 28,690 | | | |
| 2008-12-31 | Common Shares | Sunlife | 50,976 | | | |
| 2006-01-12 | Options common (Common Shares) | | 37,000 | | 37,000 | |
Insider Name: | ISENBAUM, HY | |
Insider Relationship: | 4 - Director of Issuer | |
Ceased to be Insider: | 2008-04-15 | |
| 2007-07-16 | Common Shares | | 72,926 | 72,926 | | |
| 2004-12-30 | Common Shares | PARTICIPATION HOLDINGS LTD. | 208,775 | | | |
| 2006-01-12 | Options common (Common Shares) | | 131,000 | | 131,000 | |
Insider Name: | Johnson, James Dean | |
Insider Relationship: | 4 - Director of Issuer | |
Ceased to be Insider: | 2013-11-05 | |
| 2013-10-01 | Common Shares | | 156,662 | | | |
| 2011-03-30 | Common Shares | The Murphy Group, Suntrust Investment Services | 25,000 | | | |
| 2013-01-02 | Options common (Common Shares) | | 114,000 | | 114,000 | |
Insider Name: | Lapointe, Jacques | |
Insider Relationship: | 4 - Director of Issuer | |
Ceased to be Insider: | Not Applicable | |
Insider Name: | McLeod, Bruce James | |
Insider Relationship: | 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer | |
Ceased to be Insider: | 2013-05-31 | |
| 2012-12-31 | Common Shares | | 22,442 | | | |
| 2012-12-31 | Common Shares | Sunlife | 89,129 | | | |
| 2013-01-02 | Options common (Common Shares) | | 150,000 | | 150,000 | |
Insider Name: | McRae, Graeme Kenneth Mead | |
Insider Relationship: | 4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer | |
Ceased to be Insider: | 2014-06-09 | |
| 2014-01-20 | Common Shares | | 227,662 | | | |
| 2009-03-10 | Common Shares | Renaissance London Investments Inc. | 7,550,752 | | | |
| 2013-12-31 | Common Shares | Sunlife | 294,670 | | | |
| 2013-01-02 | Options common (Common Shares) | | 364,219 | | 364,219 | |
Insider Name: | Montpetit, Joseph Bernard Patrick | |
Insider Relationship: | 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer | |
Ceased to be Insider: | 2009-09-18 | |
| 2008-12-31 | Common Shares | | 99,332 | | | |
| 2000-12-01 | Common Shares | Banque Nationale Inc. | 0 | | | |
| 2008-12-31 | Common Shares | Sunlife | 57,158 | | | |
| 2006-05-24 | Options common (Common Shares) | | 140,000 | | 140,000 | |
Insider Name: | Olds, Donald John | |
Insider Relationship: | 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer | |
Ceased to be Insider: | Not Applicable | |
| 2015-12-07 | Common Shares | | 252,159 | | | |
| 2014-01-01 | Common Shares | Spousal TFSA | 10,000 | | | |
| 2015-12-31 | Common Shares | Sunlife Canada | 106,503 | | | |
| 2015-09-09 | Options common (Common Shares) | | 3,200,000 | | 3,200,000 | |
Insider Name: | Phillips, James | |
Insider Relationship: | 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer | |
Ceased to be Insider: | 2012-06-01 | |
| 1985-03-05 | Common Shares | CIBC Wood Gundy | 3,693 | | | |
| 2011-12-31 | Common Shares | Sunlife | 108,777 | | | |
| 2011-01-27 | Options common (Common Shares) | | 227,500 | | 227,500 | |
Insider Name: | Phillips, Mairi Elizabeth | |
Insider Relationship: | 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer | |
Ceased to be Insider: | 2014-04-15 | |
| 2011-03-14 | Common Shares | | 0 | | | |
| 2013-12-31 | Common Shares | Sunlife RRSP | 146,155 | | | |
| 2011-03-14 | Common Shares | TD Waterhouse Tax Free Savings Account | 5,000 | | | |
| 2013-01-02 | Options common (Common Shares) | | 130,000 | | 130,000 | |
Insider Name: | Phillips, Nigel Charles | |
Insider Relationship: | 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer | |
Ceased to be Insider: | 2011-06-30 | |
| 2011-06-01 | Common Shares | | 60,420 | | | |
| 2011-06-01 | Common Shares | TD Waterhouse | 0 | | | |
| 2011-03-22 | Options common (Common Shares) | | 75,243 | | 75,243 | |
Insider Name: | Photiades, Nicholas | |
Insider Relationship: | 4 - Director of Issuer | |
Ceased to be Insider: | Not Applicable | |
Insider Name: | Photiades, Nikolaos | |
Insider Relationship: | 4 - Director of Issuer | |
Ceased to be Insider: | 2012-12-06 | |
| 2012-10-09 | Common Shares | | 4,830 | | | |
| 2011-01-27 | Options common (Common Shares) | | 85,000 | 85,000 | 85,000 | |
Insider Name: | Quon, Ronald Jonathan | |
Insider Relationship: | 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer | |
Ceased to be Insider: | 2008-01-07 | |
| 2007-12-31 | Common Shares | | 6,114 | | | |
| 2007-12-31 | Common Shares | Sunlife | 12,767 | | | |
Insider Name: | Rae, James Moodie | |
Insider Relationship: | 4 - Director of Issuer | |
Ceased to be Insider: | Not Applicable | |
| 2015-08-18 | Common Shares | | 184,740 | | | |
| 2016-02-29 | Common Shares | Remedis Health Care Inc. | 300,000 | | | |
| 2015-11-12 | Options common (Common Shares) | | 350,000 | | 350,000 | |
| 2015-09-25 | Warrants (Common Shares) | Remedis Health Care Inc. | 0 | | 0 | |
Insider Name: | Rogan, Dragan Radovan | |
Insider Relationship: | 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer | |
Ceased to be Insider: | 2012-07-16 | |
| 2008-12-31 | Common Shares | | 3,038 | | | |
| 2011-03-29 | Common Shares | Dundee Securities Corporation | 0 | | | |
| 2011-12-31 | Common Shares | Sunlife | 162,600 | | | |
| 2008-02-11 | Common Shares | Vera Rogan | 0 | | | |
| 2011-03-25 | Options common (Common Shares) | | 177,400 | | 177,400 | |
| 2011-03-24 | Options common (Common Shares) | Vera Rogan | 16,633 | | 16,633 | |
Insider Name: | Rubin, Michael Jeffrey | |
Insider Relationship: | 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer | |
Ceased to be Insider: | 2014-02-28 | |
| 2012-12-31 | Common Shares | | 13,486 | | | |
| 2012-12-31 | Common Shares | Sunlife | 14,522 | | | |
| 2013-01-02 | Options common (Common Shares) | | 75,000 | | 75,000 | |
Insider Name: | Shea, Jennifer Louise | |
Insider Relationship: | 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer | |
Ceased to be Insider: | 2014-05-16 | |
| 2011-01-20 | Common Shares | | 12,772 | | | |
| 2013-12-31 | Common Shares | Sunlife | 139,534 | | | |
| 2013-01-02 | Options common (Common Shares) | | 149,600 | | 149,600 | |
Insider Name: | Sutin, Richard S. | |
Insider Relationship: | 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer | |
Ceased to be Insider: | 2010-11-01 | |
| 2009-12-15 | Common Shares | | 151,000 | | | |
| 2009-12-16 | Common Shares | Jan Sutin | 51,000 | | | |
| 2009-12-16 | Common Shares | Rebecca and Ben Sutin | 42,000 | | | |
| 2009-02-12 | Common Shares | The Richard Sutin Family Trust | 0 | | | |
Insider Name: | Taillefer, Myriam | |
Insider Relationship: | 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer | |
Ceased to be Insider: | Not Applicable | |
| 2014-10-20 | Common Shares | | 0 | | | |
| 2015-11-17 | Common Shares | Detenues par son mari | 5,200 | | | |
| 2015-12-31 | Common Shares | Sunlife Canada | 37,866 | | | |
| 2015-09-09 | Options common (Common Shares) | | 200,000 | | 200,000 | |
Insider Name: | Vanclief, Lyle | |
Insider Relationship: | 4 - Director of Issuer | |
Ceased to be Insider: | 2013-11-05 | |
| 2013-10-01 | Common Shares | | 146,229 | | | |
| 2013-06-19 | Common Shares | CIBC Wood Gundy | 7,338 | | | |
| 2013-01-02 | Options common (Common Shares) | | 110,000 | | 110,000 | |
Insider Name: | Warmelink, Martin Jan | |
Insider Relationship: | 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer | |
Ceased to be Insider: | 2007-07-03 | |
| 2005-12-31 | Common Shares | | 26,325 | | | |
| 2006-12-31 | Common Shares | Sunlife | 40,008 | | | |
| 2007-02-05 | Options common (Common Shares) | | 50,000 | | 50,000 | |
Insider Name: | Weber, Gary Michael | |
Insider Relationship: | 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer | |
Ceased to be Insider: | 2012-04-30 | |
| 2011-05-06 | Common Shares | | 5,000 | | | |
| 2011-05-06 | Options common (Common Shares) | | 80,000 | | 80,000 | |
Insider Name: | Whitehead, Warren | |
Insider Relationship: | 4 - Director of Issuer | |
Ceased to be Insider: | Not Applicable | |
| 2015-12-07 | Common Shares | | 50,000 | | | |
| 2015-11-12 | Options common (Common Shares) | | 150,000 | | 150,000 | |